VA SB1543 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0328)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Wrongful death beneficiaries; parents who received support or services from the deceased for necessaries. Adds parents who received support or services from the deceased for necessaries within 12 months prior to the decedent's death to the primary list of beneficiaries who may receive a distribution of wrongful death damages. The bill applies only to causes of action arising on or after July 1, 2019. This bill is identical to HB 1767.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wrongful death beneficiaries; parents of decedent who receive support or services, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0328)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 328 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1543ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1543S1
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19104847D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 19104847D-S1
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100227D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80153(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1543
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1543+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1543S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1543ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0328+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0123+SB1543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1543+SB1543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1543+SB1543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0084+SB1543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0338+SB1543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3107+SB1543

Bill Comments

feedback