VA SB1545 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; alternative accountability process. Allows a school board to adopt an alternative accountability process to provide a principal and parties involved in an incident involving assault, or assault and battery without bodily injury, that occurs on a school bus, on school property, or at a school-sponsored event an option to enter into a mutually agreed upon process between the involved parties as an alternative to reporting such incident to law enforcement. The bill provides that a principal in a school division with such an alternative accountability process may attempt to engage the parties involved in such an incident in the process prior to reporting such incident to the local law-enforcement agency and prohibits, if provided for by the school board, a principal from reporting a party who successfully completes the alternative accountability process.
Title
Public schools; alternative accountability process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1545S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105747D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105747D-S1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103322D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 279.3:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 279.3:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |