VA SB1550 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Bicyclists and other vulnerable road users. Provides that a person who operates a motor vehicle in a careless or distracted manner and is the proximate cause of serious physical injury to a vulnerable road user, defined in the bill as a pedestrian or person riding a bicycle, electric wheelchair, electric bicycle, wheelchair, skateboard, skates, foot-scooter, animal, or animal-drawn vehicle, is guilty of a traffic infraction. The bill prohibits the driver of a motor vehicle from using or crossing into a bicycle lane to pass or attempt to pass another vehicle except to provide traffic incident management services, when directed by a law-enforcement officer, or when the roadway is otherwise impassable due to weather conditions, an accident, or an emergency situation.
Title
Bicyclists & other vulnerable road users; person who operates a motor vehicle in a careless manner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19104047D-E |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1550E |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (7-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reconsiderd by Transportation |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104047D |