VA SB1554 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0843)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); civil penalties. Provides that in addition to any penalties imposed under FOIA, (i) if a court finds that any officer, employee, or member of a public body failed to provide public records to a requester in accordance with the provisions of FOIA because such officer, employee, or member of a public body altered or destroyed the requested public records with the intention of avoiding the provisions of FOIA prior to the expiration of the applicable record retention period set pursuant to the Virginia Public Records Act, the court may impose upon such officer, employee, or member in his individual capacity a civil penalty of up to $100 per record altered or destroyed and (ii) if a court finds that a member of a public body voted to certify a closed meeting and at the time of such certification an attorney representing the body was present and such certification was not in accordance with the requirements of FOIA, the court may impose on the public body a civil penalty of up to $1,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); violations and civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0843)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 843 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1554ER2)
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-03-26SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1554ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N 1-A)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Hodges, Leftwich, Murphy
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Surovell, DeSteph, Vogel
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on amendment
2019-02-20SenateHouse amendment rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-19HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
2019-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 19103495D-E
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1554E
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (11-Y 2-N)
2019-01-21SenateAssigned GL&T sub: #1
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103495D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223714(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1554
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1554+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1554E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1554ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1554ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0843+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0076+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1554+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0321SB1554+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0032+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0274+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2955+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2998+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0878SB1554+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0985SB1554+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1077SB1554+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3346+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1136SB1554+SB1554
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3436+SB1554

Bill Comments

feedback