VA SB1564 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0682)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0682)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Board of Elections; regulations for reviewing and processing candidate petitions. Directs the State Board of Elections to revise its processes and associated regulations for reviewing and processing candidate petitions. The revised regulations are required to provide a process for checking petition signatures that includes a method for determining if a petition signature belongs to an individual whose prior registration was canceled, for tracking information associated with candidate petitions, and for escalating cases of suspected fraud to an appropriate entity. The bill requires the State Board to promulgate these regulations on or before January 1, 2020.
Title
Elections, State Board of; revision of regulations for reviewing and processing candidate petitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N) (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0682) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 682 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1564ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (78-Y 20-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1564S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106098D-S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106098D-S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103149D |