VA SB1565 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Travel insurance. Establishes procedures and requirements for travel protection plans and travel administrators. The measure establishes travel insurance as an inland marine line of insurance sold by property and casualty insurance agents. The measure (i) prohibits any person from acting as a limited lines travel insurance agent unless properly licensed, (ii) prohibits any person from acting as a travel retailer unless properly registered, and (iii) authorizes the State Corporation Commission to take enforcement actions, including suspending, revoking, or terminating a license. The measure establishes a premium tax on travel insurance premiums paid by residents of the Commonwealth and establishes acceptable practices for the sale and advertising of travel insurance. The measure applies to travel insurance policies purchased on or after July 1, 2019. This bill is identical to HB 2186.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Travel insurance; establishes procedures and requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 266 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1565ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-13HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1565S1
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105896D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105896D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102495D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3821887(n/a)See Bill Text
3821888(n/a)See Bill Text
3821888.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3821888.4(n/a)See Bill Text
5812501.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1565
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1565+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1565S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1565ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0266+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0060+SB1565
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1565+SB1565
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1565+SB1565
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0156+SB1565
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0608SB1565+SB1565
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2724+SB1565

Bill Comments

feedback