VA SB1580 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Condominium Act and Property Owners' Association Act; delivery of condominium resale certificates and association disclosure packets; right of purchaser to cancel contract. Provides that a purchaser of a unit subject to the Condominium Act or a lot subject to the Property Owners' Association Act who receives a condominium resale certificate or association disclosure packet that is not in conformity with law may cancel the contract for such unit or lot (i) within three days after the date of the contract if the resale certificate or disclosure packet is received on or before the date that the purchaser signs the contract; (ii) within three days of receiving the resale certificate or disclosure packet if the resale certificate or disclosure packet is hand delivered, delivered by electronic means, or delivered by a commercial overnight delivery service or the United States Postal Service, and a receipt obtained; or (iii) within six days after the postmark date if the resale certificate or disclosure packet is sent to the purchaser by United States mail. This bill is identical to HB 2385.
Title
Condominium Act and Property Owners' Association Act; delivery of association disclosure packets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 513 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1580ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1580S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105808D-S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105808D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101655D |