VA SB1587 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; average daily membership; early graduation. Provides that a student who graduates from a public high school in less than four school years will be counted in the average daily membership in the relevant school division until the graduation of his class cohort or he is no longer of school-age, whichever is earlier. The provisions of the bill do not apply to any student who completes a high school equivalency examination. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Public schools; average daily membership, early graduation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103351D-E |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1587E |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103351D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 274 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |