VA SB1588 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Partial exemption from real property taxes for flood mitigation efforts. Codifies an amendment to Article X, Section 6 of the Constitution of Virginia that was adopted by the voters on November 6, 2018, which enables a locality to provide by ordinance a partial exemption from real property taxes for flooding abatement, mitigation, or resiliency efforts for improved real estate that is subject to recurrent flooding. The bill provides that exemptions may only be granted for qualifying flood improvements. Qualifying flood improvements are defined in the bill as improvements that do not increase the size of any impervious area and are made to qualifying structures or to land. Qualifying structures are defined as structures that were completed prior to July 1, 2018, or were completed more than 10 years prior to the completion of the improvements. For improvements made to land, the improvements must be made primarily for the benefit of one or more qualifying structures. No exemption shall be granted for any improvements made prior to July 1, 2018.
Title
Real property taxes; partial exemption for flood mitigation efforts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 10-N) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 10-N) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 754 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1588ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (88-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (88-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (87-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103418D |