VA SB1590 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virtual Virginia. Requires that the Virtual Virginia program be made available to all public schools. Currently, the program is available only to high schools. The bill requires the Department of Education (the Department) to utilize a learning management system for the purposes of implementing Virtual Virginia. The bill also authorizes the Department to charge a per-student fee to school divisions for each student enrolled in a Virtual Virginia course beyond an initial allotment of 15 such students per school division and prohibits the Department from limiting the total number of such students by school division. The bill requires the Department to annually report on the Virtual Virginia program that includes student outcomes to the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Education and the Senate Committees on Finance and Education and Health. The Department is required to make such report by November 1 of each year for the previous school year.
Title
Virtual Virginia; availability to all public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1590S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105247D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105247D-S1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101926D |