VA SB1600 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor fuels. Requires every dispensing device used in the retail sale of motor fuel to identify the motor fuel and be labeled in accordance with a publication of the National Institute of Standards and Technology. The measure authorizes the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to amend or reject such identification or labeling requirements. Existing provisions regarding the labeling of motor fuel dispensing devices are removed.
Title
Motor fuels; labeling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 756 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1600ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred from Fin. (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104096D |