VA SB1602 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reports to Central Criminal Record Exchange; duties and authority of the Central Criminal Records Exchange; unapplied criminal history record information. Requires the Central Criminal Records Exchange (Exchange) to review offenses containing unapplied criminal history record information, defined in the bill, and make reasonable efforts to ensure that such information is applied to criminal history records. The bill requires the Exchange to submit periodic reports to the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia, the clerk of each circuit court and district court, attorneys for the Commonwealth, and law-enforcement agencies containing (i) a list of offenses with unapplied criminal history record information and (ii) for each offense, if known, the name and any other identifying information of the defendant, any identifying court case information, the date of submission to the Exchange, and the reason the offense could not be applied to the criminal history record. The bill also requires the Exchange to submit an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly on the status of unapplied criminal history record information and any updates to fingerprinting policies and procedures.
Title
Central Criminal Records Exchange; reports, duties and authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782) | |
2019-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1602ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 19106508D-H1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1602H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106508D-H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106508D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19105624D-ES1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1602ES1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to19105624D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105624D-S1 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104081D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 57.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 232 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 388 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 390 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 390.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 74 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 176.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |