VA SB1604 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cruelty to animals; serious bodily injury; penalty. Provides that any person who tortures, willfully inflicts inhumane injury or pain not connected with bona fide scientific or medical experimentation, or cruelly and unnecessarily beats, maims, or mutilates any dog or cat that is a companion animal whether belonging to him or another and as a direct result causes serious bodily injury to such dog or cat is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Current law requires that the animal die for the person to be guilty of the felony. The bill incorporates SB 1276 and is identical to HB 1874.
Title
Cruelty to animals; increases penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 537 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1604ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Ransone, Bell, Robert B., Mullin |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: DeSteph, Spruill, Chafin |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1604H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106830D-H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106830D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1604S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106347D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB1276 (Ebbin) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106347D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104235D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 403.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6569 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6570 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |