VA SB1610 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recordation tax; exemption for property transferred by deed of distribution. Provides that no recordation tax shall be required for the recordation of a deed of distribution, which is defined in the bill, when no consideration has passed between the parties. The bill also provides that a deed of distribution must state on its front page that it is a deed of distribution.
Title
Recordation tax; exemption for property transferred by deed of distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 757 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1610ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1610S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105650D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105650D-S1 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103502D |