VA SB1617 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0639)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tech Talent Investment Program. Creates a grant program to assist qualified public institutions of higher education, defined in the bill, in reaching, by 2039, a goal of increasing by at least 25,000 degrees the number of bachelor's and master's degrees awarded in computer science, computer engineering, and closely related fields, or that otherwise align with traded-sector, technology-focused growth opportunities identified by the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority. To be eligible for an annual grant, a qualified institution is required to enter into a memorandum of understanding setting forth specific criteria for eligible degrees, eligible expenses, degree production goals, and graduation rates. Failure to meet criteria would result in the adjustment of future awards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tech Talent Investment Program and Fund; created, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0639)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 639 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1617ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (92-Y 4-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference substitute printed 19107706D-S2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Rush, Jones, S.C., Sickles
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-19SenateSenators: Ruff, Saslaw, Dunnavant
2019-02-19SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-19SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-18HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (89-Y 8-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (89-Y 8-N)
2019-02-13HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (93-Y 4-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1617H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106604D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106604D-H1
2019-02-11HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1617S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105602D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105602D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-17SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102502D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311239(n/a)See Bill Text
2311242(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1617
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1617+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1617S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1617H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1617S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1617ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0639+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0074+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0259+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1617+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0415SB1617+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0416SB1617+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0179+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2777+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2789+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0695SB1617+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0814SB1617+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1090SB1617+SB1617
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3349+SB1617

Bill Comments

feedback