VA SB1618 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Office of Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance; Broadband Advisory Council; expiration. Extends the expiration of the Office of Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2021. The bill also repeals the expiration of the Broadband Advisory Council, and alters and expands from 14 to 17 its total membership. This bill is identical to HB 2541.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance, Office of, and Broadband Advisory Council; expiration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 710 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1618ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateTitle replaced 19107330D-H1
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1618H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19107330D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 19107330D-H1
2019-02-18HouseReported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1618S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106370D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106370D-S1
2019-02-01SenateReported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104184D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222699.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1618
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1618+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1618S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1618H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1618ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0710+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S10V0015+SB1618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1618+SB1618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0415SB1618+SB1618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0416SB1618+SB1618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H2001V0065+SB1618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H20V0150+SB1618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3134+SB1618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0956SB1618+SB1618

Bill Comments

feedback