VA SB1625 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide Fire Prevention Code; definition of permissible fireworks. Changes the definition of permissible fireworks for purposes of the Statewide Fire Prevention Code to mean any fountains that do not emit sparks or other burning effects to a distance greater than five meters (16.4 feet); wheels that do not emit a flame radius greater than one meter (39 inches); crackling devices and flashers or strobes that do not emit sparks or other burning effects to a distance greater than two meters (78.74 inches); and sparkling devices or other fireworks devices that (i) do not explode or produce a report, (ii) do not travel horizontally or vertically under their own power, (iii) do not emit or function as a projectile, (iv) do not produce a continuous flame longer than 20 inches, (v) are not capable of being reloaded, and (vi) if designed to be ignited by a fuse, have a fuse that is protected to resist side ignition and a burning time of not less than four seconds and not more than eight seconds. Current law defines this category of fireworks in more general terms.
Title
Statewide Fire Prevention Code; changes definition of permissible fireworks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (27-Y 71-N) (Y: 27 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (27-Y 71-N) (Y: 27 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 720 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1625ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 40-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendment (60-Y 40-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (27-Y 71-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Defeated by House (27-Y 71-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1625S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105812D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105812D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103750D |