VA SB1626 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Unlawful detainer; appeal bond. Provides that for an appeal in an unlawful detainer case, the defendant shall post an appeal bond into the general district court in the amount of outstanding rent, late charges, attorney fees, and any other charges or damages due, as contracted for in the rental agreement, due as of the date the appeal is filed with the court. Once the appeal is perfected, the defendant shall pay the rental amount as contracted for to the plaintiff on or before the fifth day of each month. The bill provides that if such amount is not paid, the judge, upon motion of the plaintiff, shall enter judgment for the outstanding amounts due and an order of possession without further hearings. As introduced, this bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful detainer; appeal bond.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 785 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1626ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House (94-Y 5-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104032D-E
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1626E
2019-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104032D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161107(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1626
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1626+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1626E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1626ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0785+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0197+SB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1626+SB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1626+SB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0348SB1626+SB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0083+SB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0339+SB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3153+SB1626

Bill Comments

feedback