VA SB1628 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; innovation; Innovative Internship Fund and Program established. Permits any public institution of higher education to propose in conjunction with the six-year plan process, and the General Assembly to adopt by reference in the general appropriation act, an innovative proposal for a performance pilot that advances the objectives of the Virginia Higher Education Opportunity Act of 2011. The bill provides that the General Assembly may approve no more than six performance pilots per year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Innovative Internship Fund and Program; created and established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 795 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1628ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N)
2019-02-23HouseReconsideration of pass by for the day agreed to
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-23HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-23SenateConference substitute printed 19107711D-S2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Rush, Jones, S.C., Torian
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-19SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Norment, Newman
2019-02-19SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-19SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-18HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1628H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106659D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106659D-H1
2019-02-11HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1628S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106062D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106062D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-17SenateRereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102480D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231306(n/a)See Bill Text
231903.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1628
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1628+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1628S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1628H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1628S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1628ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0795+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0075+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0222+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1628+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0415SB1628+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0416SB1628+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0180+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2730+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0696SB1628+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0815SB1628+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1115SB1628+SB1628
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3365+SB1628

Bill Comments

feedback