VA SB1629 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; lead testing; report. Requires each local school board to submit its plan to test and remediate certain potable water sources and report the results of any such test to the Department of Health.
Title
School boards, local; lead testing potable water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103311D |