VA SB1633 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Comparative report of local government revenues and expenditures. Changes the annual deadline for local submittal of the comparative report of local government revenues and expenditures to the Auditor of Public Accounts from November 30 to December 15 and the annual deadline for the statement of the Auditor of Public Accounts showing in detail the total and per capita revenues and expenditures of all localities for the preceding fiscal year from January 31 to February 15.
Title
Local government revenues and expenditures; comparative report, filing date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19104517D-E |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1633E |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104517D |