VA SB1634 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Economic revitalization zone. Allows any town, by ordinance, to establish one or more economic revitalization zones for the purpose of providing incentives to private entities to purchase real property and interests in real property to assemble parcels suitable for economic development. This authority is currently available only to cities. Each town establishing an economic revitalization zone may grant tax incentives and provide regulatory flexibility. Properties that are acquired through the use of eminent domain shall not be eligible for the incentives and regulatory flexibility provided by the ordinance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic revitalization zone, local; towns may establish by ordinance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 721 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1634ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Local Government (9-Y 1-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104519D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521129.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1634
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1634+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1634ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0721+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0045+SB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1634+SB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0335SB1634+SB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0702V0032+SB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0088+SB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2960+SB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3003+SB1634

Bill Comments

feedback