VA SB1638 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0635)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Newspapers; legal notice and publications; requirements. Alters the requirements for newspapers that may be used for legal notices and publications by (i) changing the publication and circulation requirement from 24 consecutive weeks to at least 50 of the preceding 52 weeks and requiring such publication be in printed form; (ii) requiring that such a newspaper provide general news coverage of the area in which the notice is to be published; and (iii) requiring that such a newspaper have a periodicals mailing permit issued by the United States Postal Service. The bill further provides that a newspaper that lacks a periodicals permit issued by the United States Postal Service may petition the circuit court for the jurisdiction in which such notices or publications are to be published, as opposed to where such newspaper is located as current law requires, for the authority to be certified as a newspaper of general circulation. The bill further allows a locality that determines that no newspaper published in such locality otherwise meets the requirements that enable it to be a newspaper for the use of such notices and publications to petition the circuit court in the jurisdiction in which such notices and publications are to be published for the authority to be published in another medium. The bill specifies that such petition shall not be filed without majority approval of the locality's local governing body. The bill requires that any newspaper authorized to publish such notices and publications shall also (a) print such notices and publications in a prominent location in such newspaper with an identifying heading in boldface letters no smaller than 24-point type and (b) maintain at least three years' worth of print archives of such newspaper and make such archives available for public inspection. The bill further requires that a newspaper shall post a notice on the newspaper's website, if such a website is published by such newspaper, and on a searchable, statewide repository website established and maintained as a joint venture of the majority of Virginia newspapers as a repository for such notices. The bill provides that any notice published on a website shall be accessible to the public at no charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Newspapers; legal notice and publications, requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0635)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 635 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1638ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1638S1
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105912D-S1
2019-01-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-30SenateRead second time
2019-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105912D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104525D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801324(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1638
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1638+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1638S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1638ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0635+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0157+SB1638
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0238SB1638+SB1638
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0256SB1638+SB1638
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0089+SB1638
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0362+SB1638
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3137+SB1638

Bill Comments

feedback