VA SB1640 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for in-state tuition; certain individuals who have applied for permanent residency.
Title
In-state tuition; eligibility, certain individuals who have applied for permanent residency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Incorporates SB1148 (Marsden) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Incorporates SB1055 (Marsden) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105236D-S1 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104527D |