VA SB1644 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; plan for sharing inmate health information between community services boards and local and regional jails. Directs the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (DBHDS) to convene a work group to study the issue of and develop a plan for sharing protected health information of individuals with mental health treatment needs who have been confined to a local or regional jail in the Commonwealth and who have previously received mental health treatment from a community services board or behavioral health authority in the Commonwealth. The bill requires DBHDS to report by October 1, 2019, to the Governor and the General Assembly on (i) development of the plan, (ii) the content of the plan, and (iii) the steps necessary to implement the plan, including any statutory or regulatory changes and any necessary appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health information; sharing between community services boards and jails.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N 1-A) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 685 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1644ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-23SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateRead third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N 1-A)
2019-01-22SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104532D-E
2019-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1644E
2019-01-22SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-22SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-22SenateRead second time
2019-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104532D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1644
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1644+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1644E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1644ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0685+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0008+SB1644
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0106SB1644+SB1644
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0142SB1644+SB1644
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0143SB1644+SB1644
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0144SB1644+SB1644
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H2001V0058+SB1644
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H20V0148+SB1644
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3138+SB1644

Bill Comments

feedback