VA SB1651 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Research and development in the Commonwealth. Creates the Partnership for Innovation and Entrepreneurship Authority (the Partnership) to oversee and support research and commercialization in the Commonwealth. The Partnership will be advised by an Investment Advisory Committee, an Entrepreneurship Advisory Committee, and a Research Advisory Committee. Existing grant, loan, and investment funds currently administered by the Innovation and Entrepreneurship Investment Authority and the Virginia Research Investment Committee would be consolidated under the Partnership. The bill repeals the existing Virginia Research Investment Committee.
Title
Partnership for Innovation and Entrepreneurship Authority; increases membership, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2019-02-24 | Senate | No further action taken |
2019-02-20 | House | Delegates: Jones, S.C., Knight, Torian |
2019-02-20 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senators: Howell, Reeves, Sturtevant |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-18 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1651H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106706D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106706D-H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1651S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106168D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB1597 (Saslaw) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106168D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19100870D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2220.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2221.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2233.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2351 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3134 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |