VA SB1653 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription Monitoring Program; veterinarians. Exempts the dispensing of feline buprenorphine or canine butorphanol from the requirement that the dispensing veterinarian report certain information about the animal and the owner of the animal to the Prescription Monitoring Program. The bill also requires that every veterinary establishment licensed by the Board of Veterinary Medicine maintain records of the dispensing of feline buprenorphine and canine butorphanol, reconcile such records monthly, and make such records available for inspection upon request.
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; veterinarians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 686 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1653ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103559D-E |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1653E |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19103559D |