VA SB1654 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Dulles Greenway. Amends the powers and responsibilities Dulles Greenway. Amends the powers and responsibilities of the State Corporation Commission (SCC) to regulate toll road operators under the Virginia Highway Corporation Act of 1988. The measure adds requirements that toll rates not materially discourage the public's use of the toll road, that the cost of operating the toll road be reasonably apportioned across all toll road users based on the relative distance each class of user travels on the toll road such that the toll rates are established in a reasonable and nondiscriminatory manner in relation to the benefit obtained, and that toll rates shall provide the operator with no more than a reasonable return. In addition, the measure (i) requires the SCC, by October 1, 2019, to initiate an investigation into the tolls charged by all operators subject to the Act and to issue a ruling by April 1, 2020, on its investigation as to whether the current tolls charged by the operator comply with such new requirements; (ii) prohibits the SCC from using the fact that any incremental return resulting from increased traffic related to a relative change in potential toll users that is greater than zero on a cumulative basis as the sole basis for finding that the operator's return exceeds a reasonable level as specified in such new requirements, during any future complaint proceeding; (iii) requires the SCC, in its initial investigation, to develop a baseline from which it can measure the relative change in potential toll users and directs how the incremental return shall be computed; (iv) prohibits an operator from seeking a toll increase that attempts to raise its return above the reasonable level; (v) requires the full disclosure, in public financial reports to the SCC, of the details of any related party transactions; and (vi) establishes a presumption that any related party transactions shall be presumed to be imprudent and excluded from costs used for any purpose, including but not limited to costs of lobbyists, excessive compensation, and entertainment expenses, unless the operator provides information showing that at least three separate competitive bids demonstrate that the operator could not have achieved better contract

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dulles Greenway; powers and responsibilities of SCC to regulate toll road operators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30SenateFailed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-09SenatePresented and ordered printed 19103865D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback