VA SB1658 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund; investments in Virginia Venture Capital Accounts. Authorizes the Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission (the Commission) to invest up to 10 percent of the available balance (as of July 1, 2019) from the taxable portion of the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund in Virginia venture capital accounts that have been certified by the Department of Taxation.
Title
Tobacco Indemnification & Community Revitalization Fund; investments in Va. Venture Capital Accts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed bill reprinted 19104403D-E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19104403D-E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1658E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104403D |