VA SB1661 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child abuse and neglect report or complaint; victims of sex trafficking; taking child victim into custody. Requires a local department of social services to conduct a sex trafficking assessment upon receiving a complaint of suspected child abuse that is based upon information and allegations that a child is a victim of sex trafficking, provided that the local department has not determined that a separate investigation or family assessment is required. The bill also allows a child-protective services worker of a local department responding to such complaint to take the child victim into custody and allows the local department to maintain custody of the child for up to 72 hours without prior approval of a parent or guardian. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. This bill is identical to HB 2597.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse and neglect; victims of sex trafficking, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 687 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1661ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Herring, Collins, Leftwich
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-19SenateSenators: Peake, Chafin, Boysko
2019-02-19SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-19SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-18HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1661H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106734D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106734D-H1
2019-02-11HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 19105310D-ES1
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1661ES1
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105310D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105310D-S1
2019-01-25SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateAssigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-10SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104124D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321506(n/a)See Bill Text
6321508(n/a)See Bill Text
6321517(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1661
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1661+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1661S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1661ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1661H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1661ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0687+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0024+SB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0149+SB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1661+SB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1661+SB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0192+SB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2732+SB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0698SB1661+SB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0817SB1661+SB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3270+SB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1028SB1661+SB1661

Bill Comments

feedback