VA SB1662 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; energy efficiency programs. Provides that any determination by the State Corporation Commission that an energy efficiency program is not in the public interest shall include with its final order the work product and analysis conducted by the staff of the Commission in making that determination. The measure provides that any utility petitioning the Commission for approval of one or more rate adjustment clauses for energy efficiency programs shall include a proposed budget for the design, implementation, and operation of the energy efficiency programs. The bill requires that any rate adjustment clause approved for an energy efficiency program remain in effect until the utility exhausts the approved budget for the energy efficiency program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; energy efficiency programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 773 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1662ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateTitle replaced 19106596D-H1
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1662H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106596D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106596D-H1
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1662S1
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105670D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105670D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-10SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104133D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1662
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1662+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1662S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1662H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1662ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0773+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0074+SB1662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1662+SB1662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0303SB1662+SB1662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0166+SB1662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2733+SB1662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0699SB1662+SB1662

Bill Comments

feedback