VA SB1674 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; short-term, limited-duration health plans; guaranteed option. Provides that any carrier offering short-term, limited-duration health plans may offer for sale a guaranteed option, defined in the bill as a contract or agreement between a covered person and a carrier that guarantees the option of the covered person to purchase a new short-term, limited-duration health plan at a future date without re-underwriting. The measure specifies that a guaranteed option is not a health benefit plan and that any guaranteed option may set a specified premium rate for any short-term, limited-duration health plan that it guarantees will be available to the covered person in the future.
Title
Health insurance; short-term, limited-duration health plans, renewal guarantees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 18-N) |
2019-03-22 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1674ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1674S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106219D-S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106219D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104119D |