VA SB1677 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child restraint devices and safety belts; emergency and law-enforcement vehicles. Exempts the operators of emergency medical services agency vehicles, fire company vehicles, fire department vehicles, and law-enforcement agency vehicles during the performance of their official duties from (i) the requirement that certain minors be secured with a safety belt and (ii) the requirement that minors under the age of eight be secured in a child restraint device provided that exigent circumstances exist and no child restraint device is readily available. This bill is identical to HB 1662.
Title
Child restraint devices and safety belts; exempts emergency and law-enforcement vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 319 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1677ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Title replaced 19106468D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1677H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106468D-H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106468D-H1 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103849D-E |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1677E |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19103849D |