VA SB1681 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; surplus property; opportunity for economic development entities to purchase prior to public sale. Provides that prior to offering surplus property for sale to the public, the Department of General Services (the Department) shall notify the chief administrative officer of the locality within which the property is located as well as any economic development entity for such locality of the pending disposition of such property. The bill provides that the chief administrative officer or local economic development entity shall have up to 180 days from the date of such notification to submit a proposal to the Department for the use by the locality or the local economic development entity of such property in conjunction with a bona fide economic development activity. The bill requires the Department to review such proposal and provides that if the Department determines that such proposal is viable and could benefit the Commonwealth, the Department may negotiate with the chief administrative officer or the local economic development entity for the sale of such property to the locality or economic development entity. This bill is identical to HB 2182.
Title
DGS; surplus property, opportunity for economic development entities to purchase.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 660 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1681ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title replaced 19106536D-H1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House with substitute (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1681H1 |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106536D-H1 |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106536D-H1 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1681S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105920D-S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105920D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19103959D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1153 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1156 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1157 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |