VA SB1686 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Volunteer assistant attorneys for the Commonwealth. Permits attorneys for the Commonwealth to appoint volunteer assistants in any jurisdiction. Under current law, attorneys for the Commonwealth may only appoint volunteer assistants in cities with a population over 350,000, any city contiguous thereto, and the City of Richmond.
Title
Volunteer assistant attorneys for the Commonwealth; appointment in certain jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 722 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1686ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19103742D |