VA SB1707 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Southwest Virginia Energy Research and Development Authority. Creates the Southwest Virginia Energy Research and Development Authority (the Authority) to promote opportunities for energy development in Southwest Virginia, to create jobs and economic activity in Southwest Virginia consistent with the Virginia Energy Plan, and to position Southwest Virginia and the Commonwealth as a leader in energy workforce and energy technology research and development. The Authority will be composed of 11 nonlegislative members, of whom four will be appointed by the Governor, four will be appointed by the Speaker of the House, and three will be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. The Authority is charged with, among other tasks, (i) leveraging the strength in energy research and workforce development of Virginia's public and private institutions of higher education; (ii) supporting the development of pump storage hydropower in Southwest Virginia and energy storage generally; (iii) promoting the development of renewable energy generation facilities on brownfield sites, including abandoned mine sites; (iv) promoting energy workforce development; and (v) assisting energy technology research and development by promoting the development of a Southwest Virginia Energy Park. The bill has a sunset date of July 1, 2029. This bill is identical to HB 2747.
Title
Southwest Virginia Energy Research and Development Authority; created, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 556 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1707ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1707S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106198D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106198D-S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104433D |