VA SB1709 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; distiller licensees; monthly revenue transfers; case fees. Provides that monthly revenue transfers from a licensed distiller to the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (i) may be submitted electronically and through other methods approved by the Board and (ii) shall be limited to the amount due to the Board in applicable taxes and markups. The bill prohibits the Board from charging a case fee for moving spirits to the tasting area of a government store established on the premises of a licensed distillery when such spirits are moved by employees of the licensed distiller. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; distiller licensees, commissions and fees, effective date for provision.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814) | |
2019-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 814 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1709ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendment (97-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (18-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1709S2 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106262D-S2 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 19105897D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106262D-S2 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105897D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104621D |