VA SB171 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0868)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0868)
Summary
Adoption by former stepparents. Allows former step-parents to adopt the child they were a stepparent to, if they stood in loco parentis to the child, as if they were still the stepparent of the child. Also allows parents who adopted a child in a foreign jurisdiction, who then divorced before the child was adopted in Virginia, to adopt or readopt the child.
Title
Adoption; former adoptive parent who stood in loco parentis may petition to adopt child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0868) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 868 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB171ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-22 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB171ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB171H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 089589204-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 089589204-H1 | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-21 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB171S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080282204-S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080282204-S1 | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087775204 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB171 |