VA SB1718 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; reading diagnostic tools; report. Directs the Department of Education (the Department) to consult with stakeholders and develop a plan to implement a pilot program to incorporate additional diagnostic tools into reading diagnostic tests used for screening students in kindergarten through grade three. The bill directs the Department to submit such plan to the General Assembly by December 1, 2019.
Title
Reading diagnostic tools; Department of Education to develop and submit plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1718ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 19106951D-H1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendment (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB1718H1 |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment by Delegate Landes agreed to |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106951D-H1 |
2019-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106951D-H1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1718S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106130D-S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106130D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104294D |