VA SB172 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; payment to out-of-network providers. Provides that when an enrollee receives emergency services from an out-of-network health care provider or receives out-of-network surgical or ancillary services at an in-network facility, the enrollee is not required to pay the out-of-network provider any amount other than the applicable cost-sharing requirement and such cost-sharing requirement cannot exceed the cost-sharing requirement that would apply if the services were provided in-network. The measure also provides that the health carrier's required payment to the out-of-network provider of the services is a commercially reasonable amount based on payments for the same or similar services provided in a similar geographic area. If such provider disputes the amount to be paid by the health carrier, the measure requires the provider and the health carrier to make a good faith effort to reach a resolution on the amount of the reimbursement. If the health carrier and the provider do not agree to a commercially reasonable payment and either party wants to take further action to resolve the dispute, then the measure requires the dispute will be resolved by arbitration. The measure establishes a framework for arbitration of such disputes which includes (i) a timeline for the proceedings, (ii) a method for choosing an arbitrator, (iii) required and optional factors for the arbitrator to consider, (iv) non-disclosure agreements, (v) reporting requirements, and (vi) an appeals process for appeals on certain procedural grounds. The measure requires the State Corporation Commission to contract with Virginia Health Information (VHI) to establish a data set and business protocols to provide health carriers, providers, and arbitrators with data to assist in determining commercially reasonable payments and resolving disputes. The measure requires the Commission, in consultation health carriers, providers, and consumers, to develop standard language for a notice of consumer rights regarding balance billing. The measure authorizes the Commission, the Board of Medicine, and the Commissioner of Health to levy fines and take action against a health carrier, health care practitioner, or medical care facility, respectively, for a pattern of violations of the prohibition against balance billing. Additionally, the measure prohibits a carrier or provider from initiating arbitration with such frequency as to indicate a general business practice. The measure provides that such provisions do not apply to an entity that provides or administers self-insured or self-funded plans; however, such entities may elect to be subject to such provisions. The measure authorizes the Commission to adopt rules and regulations governing the arbitration process. The measure has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.
Title
Health insurance; definitions, payment to out-of-network providers, emergency services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1081) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1081 (effective - see bill) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB172ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title replaced 20109578D-H2 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB172H2 |
2020-03-05 | House | Substitute by Delegate Torian agreed to 20109578D-H2 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee substitute rejected 20109092D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-04 | House | Floor substitute printed 20109578D-H2 (Torian) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Incorporates SB522 |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20109092D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20107408D-ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB172ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107408D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (11-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107408D-S1 |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Health Insurance |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101733D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1251 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1080)
SB522 (Same As) 2020-02-09 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
SB522 (Same As) 2020-02-09 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor