VA SB1724 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Employment records; written request from employee; subpoena duces tecum; penalty for failure to provide. Provides that an employer shall furnish a copy of certain employment records or papers within 30 days of receipt of a written request of a current or former employee or employee's attorney. The bill provides that the employer may charge a reasonable fee to comply with such a request. The bill further provides that a subpoena duces tecum may be issued upon the failure of an employer to comply with such a written request and that if the court finds that an employer willfully refused to comply with such a written request, as outlined in the bill, the court may award damages for all expenses incurred by the employee. The bill provides that copies of an employee's records or papers may be withheld from such employee if the employee's treating physician or clinical psychologist states that providing such records to such employee would be reasonably likely to endanger the life or physical safety of the employee or another person. This bill incorporates SB 1682.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment records; written request from employee, subpoena duces tecum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 733 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1724ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1724S1
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105722D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateIncorporates SB1682 (Mason)
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105722D-S1
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-16SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104902D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801413.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1724
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1724+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1724S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1724ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0733+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0121+SB1724
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1724+SB1724
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1724+SB1724
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0081+SB1724
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0340+SB1724
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3109+SB1724

Bill Comments

feedback