VA SB1726 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; happy hour advertising. Expands the ability of retail on-premises licensees to advertise happy hours by allowing them to advertise the prices of featured alcoholic beverages and to use creative marketing techniques, provided that such techniques do not tend to induce overconsumption or consumption by minors. This bill incorporates SB 1170 and is identical to HB 2073.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; happy hour advertising.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007) | |
2019-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 7 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 13, 2019 | |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 6, 2019 |
2019-02-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1726ER) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House (94-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1726S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105295D-S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Incorporates SB1170 (McPike) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105295D-S1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104599D |