VA SB1728 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Standards of Learning Innovation Committee; repeal. Repeals the Standards of Learning Innovation Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of Learning Innovation Committee; repeals the Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 771 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1728ER)
2019-02-21SenateEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N 1-A)
2019-02-18HousePassed House (79-Y 18-N 1-A)
2019-02-18HouseRead third time
2019-02-15HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-14HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseReported from Education (17-Y 5-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1728S1
2019-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106133D-S1
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106133D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-16SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104586D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:10(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1728
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1728+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1728S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1728ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0771+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0164+SB1728
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1728+SB1728
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1728+SB1728
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0348SB1728+SB1728
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0901V0033+SB1728
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0142+SB1728
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2885+SB1728

Bill Comments

feedback