VA SB1737 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0847)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil relief; citizens of the Commonwealth furloughed or otherwise not receiving wages or payments due to partial closure of the federal government. Provides a 30-day stay of eviction and foreclosure proceedings for tenants, homeowners, and owners who rent to a tenant a one-family to four-family residential dwelling unit who request a stay and provide written proof, defined in the bill, that they are (i) an employee of the United States government, (ii) an independent contractor for the United States government, or (iii) an employee of a company under contract with the United States government who was furloughed or was or is otherwise not receiving wages or payments as a result of the partial closure of the United States government beginning on December 22, 2018. The bill contains an emergency clause. The bill has an expiration date of September 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil relief; citizens furloughed or otherwise not receiving wages, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0847)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 847 (effective 4/3/19)
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1737ER2)
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03 Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-03-21SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1737ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20SenateTitle replaced 19107004D-H1
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1737H1
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19107004D-H1
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 19107004D-H1
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 19105943D-ES1
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1737ES1
2019-02-04SenateEmergency clause deleted
2019-02-04SenateAmendments by Senator McPike agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-04SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-01SenateReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateRequires 32 affirmative votes for passage
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and defeated by Senate (26-Y 13-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1737S1
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105943D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105943D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced bill reprinted 19103875D
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed with emergency clause 19103875D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1737
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1737+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1737S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1737ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1737H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1737ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1737ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0847+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0091+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1737+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0304SB1737+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0309SB1737+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0322SB1737+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0323SB1737+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0324SB1737+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1102V0024+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0262+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2965+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3008+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0884SB1737+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1136SB1737+SB1737
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3441+SB1737

Bill Comments

feedback