VA SB1738 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Illegal gambling; definition. Amends the definition of illegal gambling to clarify that the making, placing, or receipt of any bet or wager of money or other consideration or thing of value shall include the purchase of a product, Internet access, or other thing made in exchange for a chance to win a prize, stake, or other consideration or thing of value by means of the operation of a gambling device, regardless of whether the chance to win such prize, stake, or other consideration or thing of value may be offered in the absence of a purchase. This bill incorporates SB 1721.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Illegal gambling; definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1738ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-20HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1738S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105618D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 1-N)
2019-01-30SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-30SenateIncorporates SB1721 (Cosgrove)
2019-01-30SenateSubstitute bill reprinted 19105618D-S1
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105618D-S1
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104327D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182325(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1738
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1738+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1738S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1738ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0761+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0194+SB1738
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0242+SB1738
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1738+SB1738
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0437SB1738+SB1738
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0418SB1738+SB1738
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0149+SB1738
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0352+SB1738
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3111+SB1738
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0949SB1738+SB1738

Bill Comments

feedback