VA SB1749 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0083)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0083)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Robert O. Norris Bridge and Statewide Special Structure Fund. Establishes the Robert O. Norris Bridge and Statewide Special Structure Fund to be used for the purpose of funding maintenance and replacement of large and unique structures. The bill also requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board to (i) undertake a comprehensive review of the current and future condition of pavements and bridges in the Commonwealth; (ii) dedicate a portion of certain funds to the Robert O. Norris Bridge and Statewide Special Structure Fund; and (iii) evaluate the feasibility of using the Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995 to design, build, operate, and maintain two bridges to replace the Robert O. Norris Bridge on State Route 3 and the Downing Bridge on U.S. Route 360.
Title
Robert O. Norris Bridge and Statewide Special Structure Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0083) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 83 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1749ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1749S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Substitute by Senator McDougle agreed to 19106283D-S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 19106283D-S1 (McDougle) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104284D |