VA SB1750 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medicaid Supplemental Payment Program Fund. Establishes the Medicaid Supplemental Payment Program Fund (the Fund). The bill requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to accept and to pay into the Fund, from any county, city, or town provider, assessment funds that have been collected, pursuant to an ordinance, from inpatient hospitals authorized to receive Medicaid supplemental payments pursuant to the State Plan for Medical Assistance Services amendments 11-018 and 11-019. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Medicaid Supplemental Payment Program Fund; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103903D-E |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1750E |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19103903D |