VA SB1754 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood Assistance Act tax credits. Allows a neighborhood organization to qualify to receive an allocation of tax credits from the Department of Education if (i) at least 50 percent of the persons served by the neighborhood organization, either directly by the neighborhood organization or through the provision of revenues to other organizations or groups serving such persons, are low-income persons or eligible students with disabilities and (ii) at least 50 percent of the neighborhood organization's revenues are used to provide services to low-income persons or eligible students with disabilities, either directly by the organization or through the provision of revenues to other organizations or groups providing such services.
Title
Neighborhood Assistance Act; tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1754S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106013D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB1730 (Deeds) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106013D-S1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104430D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.20:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |