VA SB1756 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Condominium Act; Virginia Property Owners' Association Act; stormwater facilities; transfer of control of management, maintenance, repair, or replacement. Requires a declarant to deliver to the president of the unit owners' association or his designated agent, or in the case of a property-owners' association, the board of directors or their designee, an inventory and description of stormwater facilities located on their premises. The bill requires the delivery of final site plans and applicable recorded easements and agreements regarding the inventory and description of stormwater management facilities located on common elements of a condominium or property owners' association property so that such associations are aware of the requirements for the maintenance, repair, or replacement of the stormwater facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Condominium and Virginia Property Owners' Association Acts; stormwater facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 724 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1756ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104291D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1756
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1756+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1756ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0724+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0090+SB1756
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1756+SB1756
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1756+SB1756
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0031+SB1756
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0276+SB1756
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2968+SB1756
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3011+SB1756

Bill Comments

feedback