VA SB1758 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Jurisdiction of juvenile and domestic relations district courts; state or federal benefit. Grants the juvenile and domestic relations district courts jurisdiction to make specific findings of fact required by state or federal law to enable a child to apply for or receive a state or federal benefit. This bill is identical to HB 2679. Jurisdiction of juvenile and domestic relations district courts; state or federal benefit. Grants the juvenile and domestic relations district courts jurisdiction to make specific findings of fact required by state or federal law to enable a child to apply for or receive a state or federal benefit. This bill is identical to HB 2679.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; jurisdiction, specific findings of fact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (7-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 631 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1758ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2019-02-22SenateConference substitute printed 19107605D-S1
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Kilgore, Miyares, Toscano
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Surovell, Peake, Stanley
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1758H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19107078D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 19107078D-H1
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N)
2019-01-30SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100235D-E
2019-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1758E
2019-01-30SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-30SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-30SenateRead second time
2019-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (7-Y 6-N 1-A)
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 19100235D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1758
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1758+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1758E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1758H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1758S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1758ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0631+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0160+SB1758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0238SB1758+SB1758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0265SB1758+SB1758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0085+SB1758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0341+SB1758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3112+SB1758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0950SB1758+SB1758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0998SB1758+SB1758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1052SB1758+SB1758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3305+SB1758

Bill Comments

feedback